Hanes ariannol THE FRANK AND GEORGE SIMPSON AND DR RABY TRUST FUND
Rhif yr elusen: 203927
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £6 | £6 | £6 | £5 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £0 | £270 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.