Dogfen lywodraethu GILLIGATE CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE 6 OCTOBER 1922 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF THE 31 JANUARY 1995. AMENDED BY SCHEME 3 JANUARY 2001 AND SCHEME DATED 4 DECEMBER 2008. as amended on 21 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ESTATE FUND INCOME TO BE APPLIED (A) FOR MEETING THE COST OF MAINTENANCE OF PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY; (B) FOR DEFRAYING ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS OF THE CHARITY; (C) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ERF SUBJECT TO THE ABOVE,THE INCOME TO BE DIVIDED AS FOLLOWS:- (1) ONE-EIGHTH TO ST.GILES SCHOOL FUND (2) ONE-EIGTH TO BELMONT SCHOOL FUND (3) FOUR-EIGHTHS TO THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.GILES DURHAM (4) TWO-EIGHTHS TO THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.MARY MAGDALENE,BELMONT. THE CHARITY FUND INCOME TO BE APPLIED FOR DEFRAYING ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS OF THE CHARITY AND SUBJECT THERETO,AS FOLLOWS:- (1) ONE HALF TOWARDS PROVIDING THE STIPEND FOR A CURATE FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.GILES,DURHAM; (2) ONE HALF TOWARDS PROVIDING THE STIPEND FOR A CURATE FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.MARY MAGDALENE,BELMONT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSES 3-10 OF 1995 SCHEME).
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF ST.GILES,DURHAM AND PARISH OF BELMONT,DURHAM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.