Trosolwg o’r elusen STAFFORD SAMARITANS
Rhif yr elusen: 1167807-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
RULES ADOPTED 19/11/1964
AS AMENDED ON 19/11/1981
AS AMENDED ON 16/11/1984
AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2003
AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2005
AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2007
AS AMENDED ON 19/11/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN STAFFORD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE , IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
STAFFORD AND DISTRICT
Hanes cofrestru
- 23 Mawrth 1965: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.