Dogfen lywodraethu CABRINI CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 1902 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS ON 11 SEPTEMBER 1963, 27 OCTOBER 1982 AND 17 JUNE 2008, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 6 JANUARY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO UNDERTAKE THE SUPPORT CARE EDUCATION AND MAINTENANCE OF,AND OTHERWISE TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL MENTAL MORAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WITH A PARTICULAR PRIORITY FOR THOSE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH WHO ARE EITHER POOR OR DEPRIVED OF HOME,FAMILY OR PARENTS OR IN DANGER OF SUCH DEPRIVATION OR HANDICAPPED. (SEE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION FOR FULL DETAILS.)
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.