Dogfen lywodraethu THE CENTRAL DEACONESS HOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONVEYANCE DATED 3RD MARCH 1927, DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3RD JUNE 1929, CONVEYANCE DATED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1945, COMMISSIONERS' SCHEMES OF 31ST OCTOBER 1962 AND 7TH DECEMBER 1972 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH MARCH 1984.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER THE SPIRITUAL MORAL INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING OF DEACONESSES THROUGHOUTH THE ANGLICAL COMMUNION AND FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR WORK AND INFLUENCE AND FOR THE OFFERING OF PRAYERS FOR THE WHOLE ORDER OF DEACONESSES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.