Dogfen lywodraethu THE FINCHLEY CHORAL SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 265563
Cyfredol
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 9TH NOVEMBER 1970 AS AMENDED 6TH NOVEMBER 1978, 19TH MAY 1980 AND 11TH OCTOBER 1982 AND 11TH JUNE 2001 AND 8TH OCTOBER 2001.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE FOR THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF CHORAL MUSIC, AND THE FOSTERING OF PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.