Dogfen lywodraethu THE MURRAY SMITH (ST ANDREWS HOME, MATLOCK) TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 265981
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 1ST NOVEMBER 1929 AND 13TH OCTOBER 1930 AND SCHEMES OF THE 13TH NOVEMBER 1969 AND 16TH MAY 1973
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVISION OF HIGHER EDUCATION, APPRENTICESHIP OR TRAINING (INCLUDING THE MAKING OF LOANS, FREE OF INTEREST IF THOUGH FIT) OR OTHER SIMILAR BENEFIT OR ADVANCEMENT FOR BOYS. IN AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE MURRAY SMITH TRUST COMPRISED IN A SCHEME OF 13TH NOVEMBER 1939.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.