Dogfen lywodraethu FORUM FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATIONAL THERAPY AND THERAPEUTIC TEACHING FAETT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH NOVEMBER 1973 AND AMENDED 24TH NOVEMBER 1978 AND 1ST DECEMBER 1984 AND 16TH MARCH 1992 AND 22 NOVEMBER 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO DEVELOP THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF EDUCATIONAL THERAPY AS A MODE OF TREATMENT FOR LEARNING DISABILITIES AND TO THIS END TO ESTABLISH AND DEVELOP PROFESSIONAL STANDARDS IN THE PRACTICE OF EDUCATIONAL THERAPY, AND DISSEMINATE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE METHOD. 2. TO PROMOTE THE PSYCHOLOGICAL INSIGHT OF TEACHERS IN GENERAL INTO EMOTIONAL FACTORS IN LEARNING AND FAILURE LEARN AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF METHODS FOR DEALING WITH THESE. 3. TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR MEMBERS TO DISCUSS THEIR CASES AND SEEK ADVICE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.