Dogfen lywodraethu HOSPITAL RADIO NORWICH
Rhif yr elusen: 270189

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1978, 7TH NOVEMBER 1979, 27TH FEBRUARY 1984, 24TH FEBRUARY 1988, 22ND JANUARY 1989, 27TH FEBRUARY 1991 AND 24 FEBRUARY 1993 AND 12TH MAY 2000
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND THE STRESS AND DISTRESS CAUSED TO PERSONS THROUGH HOSPITALISATION AS WELL AS HELP TO DISTRACT FROM THE MONOTONY OF HOSPITAL ROUTINE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
THE AREA SERVED BY NORFOLK AREA HEALTH AUTHORITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.