Dogfen lywodraethu CHIPPING SODBURY TOWN TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 274443

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CHIPPING SODBURY TOWN TRUST SCHEME CONFIRMATION ACT 2 JUNE 1960, SCHEME OF 14 JUNE 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 21 MAY 1996 AND BY RESOLUTIONS 5 JULY 2007, 6 MARCH 2008 AND 2 JULY 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME FOR THE UPKEEP OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SODBURY AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
CIVIL PARISH OF SODBURY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.