Dogfen lywodraethu THE WINCHELSEA BEACH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED ON 13TH MARCH 1990 AND ON 17 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUL 2021 as amended on 30 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF WINCHELSEA BEACH AS DEFINED BY ROTHER DISTRICT AND ICKLESHAM PARISH COUNCILS WITHOUT DISTINCTION ON ANY PERSONAL, POLITICAL, RACIAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER GROUNDS; LIKEWISE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO PROMOTE SOCIAL WELFARE BY WAY OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF ENHANCING THE QUALITY OF LIFE SAID RESIDENTS. (B) TO CONTINUE TO SECURE THE EXISTENCE OF THE ESTABLISHED COMMUNITY HALL (HEREINAFTER CALL "THE HALL") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAID HALL IN ORDER THAT IT MAY BE USED FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED AND/OR APPROVED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS SECTIONS AND PARTICIPATING CONSTITUENT BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL AND NON-SECTARIAN. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO AFFILIATE TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
THE VILLAGE OF WINCHELSEA BEACH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.