Dogfen lywodraethu BISHOP'S STORTFORD DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 281725

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 1999, 14 NOVEMBER 2000 AND 11 NOVEMBER 2008. as amended on 14 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE AESTHETIC EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.