Dogfen lywodraethu THE KINGS CHURCH STAINES
Rhif yr elusen: 288292
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 MAY 1983, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 8 JANUARY 1988, ORDER DATED 3 FEBRUARY 2003, DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 25 FEBRUARY 2003, AND 9 MAY 2004.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE WORSHIP OF GOD, THE INSTRUCTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN, THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH GENERALLY.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.