Dogfen lywodraethu BROADLAND MERIDIAN

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/09/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/07/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/07/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PSYCHIATRIC OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF PHYSICAL OR MENTAL REHABILITATION BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.