Dogfen lywodraethu HARROW FILM MAKERS
Rhif yr elusen: 292696

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/09/1985 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/1989 AS AMENDED ON 12/04/1998 AS AMENDED ON 13/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 08/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF GENERAL EDUCATION IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF VIDEOGRAPHY, CINEMATOGRAPHY, MOTION PICTURES AND ASSOCIATED AUDIO AND VISUAL ARTS AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.