Dogfen lywodraethu PLYMOUTH THEATRE ROYAL APPLAUSE CLUB
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION OF THE 18 AUGUST 1986, AS AMENDED ON 17 JUNE 1989, SEPTEMBER 1991, 16 SEPTEMBER 1995, 6 SEPTEMBER 1997, SEPTEMBER 1999, 9 SEPTEMBER 2000, SEPTEMBER 2001, 7 SEPTEMBER 2002, 9 SEPTEMBER 2006 & 6TH SEPTEMBER 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN RELATION TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, DANCE, SINGING AND MUSIC AND THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF SUCH ARTS BY SUPPORTING THE THEATRE ROYAL (PLYMOUTH) LIMITED (B) TO PROMOTE THE ARTS WITHIN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ENCOURAGING PUBLIC INTEREST, INVOLVEMENT AND APPRECIATION. (C) TO ORGANISE LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS, VISITS, DISCUSSIONS, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AND TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS (D) TO CO-OPERATE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS, SOCIETIES, COMPANIES AND INDIVIDUALS IN FURTHERANCE OF ALL OR ANY OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS (E) TO DO ALL OR ANY SUCH OTHER THINGS AS MAY BE NECESSARY OR DESIRABLE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE AFOREMENTIONED OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.