Dogfen lywodraethu THE LUNDY PONY PRESERVATION SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 297119
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES OF SOCIETY DATED 14TH MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 29TH MAY 1987 AND 9TH APRIL 1990 AS AMENDED 30TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AND 10 FEBRUARY 1996
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE AND TO IMPROVE THE STANDARD OF BREEDING OF THE BRAETOR LUNDY PONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.