Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH EDUCATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY AGENCY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JANUARY 1987 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 29 MARCH 1989, 3 MARCH 1998, 17 JUNE 2004 AND 18 JULY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PEOPLE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND BY: 1. SUPPORTING ENCOURAGING PROMOTING EVALUATING DEVELOPING APPLYING AND MAINTAINING THE USE OF SYSTEMS TECHNIQUES AIDS DISCOVERIES AND INVENTIONS CONDUCIVE TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION MICROELECTRONIC SYSTEMS MICROCOMPUTERS AND ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AND OTHER ASPECTS OF INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN ALL SPHERES RELEVANT TO THE NEEDS OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ALL KINDS; AND 2. SUPPORTING ENCOURAGING AND PROMOTING RESEARCH AND INNOVATION AND GOOD PRACTICE IN EDUCATIONAL TECHNOLOGY. THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.