Dogfen lywodraethu FRIENDS OF POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Rhif yr elusen: 298373

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 14TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 7TH DECEMBER 1994, 10TH MAY 1995, 7 MAY 2008 AND 6 MAY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ASSIST PATIENTS AND STAFF OF POTTERS BAR COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND GENERALLY SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL B) WHEN POSSIBLE PROVIDE FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PATIENTS OR STAFF TO ASSIST THE EFFICIENT RUNNING OF THE HOSPITAL
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
POTTERS BAR
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.