Dogfen lywodraethu KENT GUILD OF SPINNERS DYERS AND WEAVERS
Rhif yr elusen: 298446
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 NOV 1986 AS AMENDED ON 31 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 1992 AS AMENDED ON 29 MAR 2008 AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRAFTMANSHIP IN HAND-WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTMANSHIP.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
KENT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.