Dogfen lywodraethu HUNTLEY STREET CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/06/1988 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 27/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 31/03/2008 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR OR TOWARDS THE ESTABLISHMENT ENDOWMENT AND SUPPORT OF THE UCL CANCER INSTITUTE, ROYAL FREE AND UNIVERSITY COLLEGE MEDICAL SCHOOL AND THE RONALD RAVEN CHAIR IN CLINICAL ONCOLOGY AT UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON (UCL) - FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE SCHEME OF 18 OCTOBER 2007
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.