Dogfen lywodraethu TRURO CATHEDRAL SCHOOL LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 306582

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1960,AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 MARCH 1985 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 MARCH 1982, 19 JUNE 1984 AND AMENDED ON THE 26TH JUNE 1995.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE INDEPENDENT EDUCATION FOR BOYS, GIRLS AND STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SCHOOLS IN THE DIOCESE OF TRURO IN WHICH INSTRUCTION IS GIVEN I.A.W. THE DOCTRINES OF THE C OF E AND/OR CHURCHES IN COMMUNION THEREWITH.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
DIOCESE OF TRURO
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.