Dogfen lywodraethu MAIDSTONE GRAMMAR SCHOOLS
Rhif yr elusen: 307837
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
SCHEME OF 18 FEBRUARY 1910 AS VARIED BY FURTHER SCHEMES OF 17 DECEMBER 1914, 31 JANUARY 1922, 22 JUNE 1928, 1 AUGUST 1934 AND ARTICLES OF GOVERNMENT OF 6 JUNE 1947
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR BOYS 2) A DAY OR BOARDING SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.