Dogfen lywodraethu BLESSED WILLIAM HOWARD PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 NOV 1975 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2001 AS AMENDED ON 20 SEP 2004 AS AMENDED ON 04 NOV 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE BLESSED WILLIAM HOWARD CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY: (A) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. (B) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.