Dogfen lywodraethu LODGE AND WEST DENE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Rhif yr elusen: 312610
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 MARCH 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1969, 10 MARCH 1997 AND 1 FEBRUARY 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31 DECEMBER 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENCOURAGE, FOSTER, ASSIST AND PROMOTE IN ANY MANNER WHATSOEVER ANY OBJECT WHICH IS BOTH CHARITABLE AND EDUCATIONAL
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.