Dogfen lywodraethu BETJEMAN MILLENNIUM PARK
Rhif yr elusen: 1064054

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAR 1997 AS AMENDED ON 22 JUN 1997 AS AMENDED ON 04 AUG 1998 AS AMENDED ON 24 NOV 2016 as amended on 24 Nov 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION PRESERVATION PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF A PUBLIC PARK AND OTHER RECREATIONAL AMENITIES FORMERLY KNOWN AS "WHEELERS ORCHARD") ANY OTHER LAND OR AMENITY AS SHALL OR MAY AT ANY TIME BE VESTED IN THE CHARITY: FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
WANTAGE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.