Dogfen lywodraethu THE GRIMETHORPE, SHAFTON AND BRIERLEY COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JANUARY 1998, 8 JUNE 1998, 28 SEPTEMBER 1999 AND 17 JULY 2000.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS LIVING IN GRIMETHORPE, SHAFTON AND BRIERLEY BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM, AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS (3) TO PROMOTE OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
GRIMETHORPE, SHAFTON AND BRIERLEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.