Hanes ariannol CLEEVE PRIOR CHURCH OF ENGLAND (VOLUNTARY CONTROLLED) FIRST SCHOOL PARENT AND TEACHER ASSOCIATION
Rhif yr elusen: 1065004

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £10.01k | £1.73k | £736 | £1.59k | £1.93k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £475 | £433 | £1.86k | £2.34k | £7.52k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.