Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHERN LEARNING TRUST
Rhif yr elusen: 1075463
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED 15TH OCTOBER 2002, 13 OCTOBER 2003, 22ND MARCH 2004 AND 11 OCTOBER 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE LEARNING, INCLUDING LITERACY, NUMERACY AND COMMUNICATION SKILLS ACROSS THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.