Dogfen lywodraethu DERBYSHIRE TOY LIBRARIES (DTL)
Rhif yr elusen: 1081255

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2000 AS AMENDED ON 14/07/2000 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2002 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/03/2014 as amended on 15 Feb 2023 as amended on 04 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
For the public benefit and education of all local children and the general public, by the provision of educational and stimulating toys and resources.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.