Dogfen lywodraethu REDBRIDGE ISLAMIC CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 1081870

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 APRIL 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 20 JULY 2000, 7 JULY 2002, BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF 24 OCTOBER 2002 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 OCTOBER 2003.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.