Trosolwg o'r elusen THE DRESDEN ASSISTANCE FUND IN CONNECTION WITH QUEEN CHARLOTTE'S MATERNITY HOSPITAL

Rhif yr elusen: 1059138-26
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
WILL PROVED 2 FEBRUARY 1904 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 3 OCTOBER 1969. DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2000 AND OGL DATED 28 JULY 2000. SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 7 MAY 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE BENEFIT AND ASSISTANCE ON THEIR DISCHARGE OF NEEDY AND DESERVING IN-PATIENTS OF ANY HOSPITAL FROM TIME TO TIME COMPRISED IN THE GROUP OF HOSPITALS UNDER THE MANAGEMENT OF THE IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST. THE AMOUNT OF ASSISTANCE TO BE GIVEN TO EACH BENEFICIARY SHALL NOT EXCEED TEN PER CENT OF THE NET INCOME OF THE CHARITY GENERATED IN THE PREVIOUS FINANCIAL YEAR. IF NOT REQUIRED AS AFORESAID THE INCOME MAY BE APPLIED FOR ASSISTING IN CASES OF NEED PATIENTS WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT AT ANY HOSPITALS IN THE SAID GROUP
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Hanes cofrestru
  • 06 Ebrill 2009: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1128929 IMPERIAL COLLEGE HEALTHCARE CHARITIES
  • 04 Gorffennaf 2001: Cofrestrwyd
  • 06 Ebrill 2009: Tynnwyd (CYFARWYDDYD UNO (S96))
Enwau eraill

Dim enwau eraill