Dogfen lywodraethu MANSFIELD BOWLING CLUB
Rhif yr elusen: 1091055
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
RULES DATED 12 NOVEMBER 1923 AS REVISED 5 MAY 1952, 7 APRIL 1982, 10 APRIL 1985, 8 APRIL 1987, 20 AUGUST 2001 AND 13 FEBRUARY 2002
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE A BOWLS CLUB IN MANSFIELD, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CLUB IS PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF THE FACILITIES.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
MANSFIELD, NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.