Dogfen lywodraethu FARNHAM REP LTD
Rhif yr elusen: 1093817

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2002 AND 30 APRIL 2007 AND CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAY 2006 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN FARNHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE DRAMATIC ARTS.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
SURREY - FARNHAM
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.