Dogfen lywodraethu THE LISTENING CENTRE
Rhif yr elusen: 1098571

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 2003, 21 JUNE 2003, 20 JUNE 2004, 28 APRIL 2007 AND 10 MAY 2008 as amended on 09 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To relieve the needs of people with mental health issues in Oxfordshire and the surrounding area by the provision of counselling and psychotherapy services.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
BLACKBIRD LEYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.