Dogfen lywodraethu HUMBER LEARNING CONSORTIUM

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 23 APRIL 2004, 4 AUGUST 2005, 17 JULY 2008 AND 2 FEBRUARY 2009
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO: (A) TO IMPROVE ACCESS TO LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES FOR USERS, VOLUNTEERS AND EMPLOYEES OF VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS IN THE HUMBER AND YORKSHIRE; (B) TO DEVELOP VOLUNTARY SECTOR LEARNING PROVIDERS TO MEET QUALITY THRESHOLDS AND STAKEHOLDER REQUIREMENTS; (C) TO DEVELOP A PARTNERSHIP APPROACH TO THE DELIVERY AND DEVELOPMENT OF LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND GOOD PRACTICE; (D) TO CARRY OUT ANY ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES; (E) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY GROUPS BASED IN THE HUMBER AND YORKSHIRE REGION BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND ONGOING SUPPORT TO INCREASE THEIR ABILITY TO ACCESS FUNDING AND PARTICIPATE IN THE REGENERATION OF THEIR AREA.
Maes buddion
HUMBER AND YORKSHIRE REGION
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.