Dogfen lywodraethu REFUGEE AND MIGRANT DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (RAMDA)
Rhif yr elusen: 1101595

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JANUARY 2003, AS AMENDED 15 JUNE 2003, AS AMENDED 14 DECEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 31 AUGUST 2006, AS AMENDED 28 FEBRUARY 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE HORN OF AFRICA COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AS WELL AS EASTERN AFRICA KNOWN AS THE HORN OF AFRICA WHICH ARE SOMALIA AND ETHIOPIA.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UK, SOMALIA AND ETHIOPIA.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.