Dogfen lywodraethu LION DE JUDA CHURCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED 7 DECEMBER 2003, 21 MARCH 2004, 24 APRIL 2005 AND 4 FEBRUARY 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST, THE LORD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FUNDAMENTAL TRUTHS OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME; THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS; THE PROVISION OF MARRIAGE AND FAMILY COUNSELLING ; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.