Dogfen lywodraethu BOLTON DEMENTIA SUPPORT
Rhif yr elusen: 1123776

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (26 diwrnod yn hwyr)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/04/2008 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2013 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 20/08/2014 as amended on 09 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS AND TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH SUCH ACTIVITIES AND SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LANCASHIRE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.