Dogfen lywodraethu MIY (More in You) INC
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/04/2012 as amended on 06 Feb 2018 as amended on 06 Feb 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS ARE TO CARRY OUT ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (“THE OBJECTS”) AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: A. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE PREGNANT OR LOOKING AFTER CHILDREN AND ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND ADVICE. B. THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF DEBT COUNSELLING AND A DEBT MANAGEMENT SERVICE. C. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION AMONGST YOUNG PERSONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SAFE AND SATISFYING PLAY, AND SUCH OUT OF SCHOOL ACTIVITIES AS WILL INCULCATE GOOD CITIZENSHIP. D. IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. E. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF CRIME BY CO-OPERATING WITH THE POLICE! LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VICTIM SUPPORT AND LIKE STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES. F. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OR RETRAINING AND, IN CO-OPERATION WITH THE STATUTORY AGENCIES, THE PROVISION OF WORK EXPERIENCE FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.