Dogfen lywodraethu KYEKUS LIMITED

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 MAR 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 JAN 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH, EQUALITY AND INDEPENDENCE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE (AND ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE) BY: 1.1 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED; 1.2 PROVIDING SUCH ASSISTANCE AS CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED MAY REQUIRE TO LEAD INDEPENDENT LIVES TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT OR OTHERWISE TO MEET THEIR NEEDS; 1.3 PROVIDING FAMILY SUPPORT SERVICES, ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR FAMILIES OF CHILDREN WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN; 1.4 PROVIDING SUCH SERVICES, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHER PEOPLE AS THE SOCIETY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DEEM FIT
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.