Dogfen lywodraethu LGBTQ+ Project

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED ON 20 APR 2009 AS AMENDED ON 01 SEP 2016 as amended on 23 Jan 2024 as amended on 11 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND EMOTIONAL SUFFERING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE NORFOLK AREA WHO ARE LESBIAN, GAY OR BISEXUAL (LBG) OR IN DOUBT OF THEIR SEXUALITY, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, PEER-SUPPORT AND INFORMATION. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR AMONGST LGB PEOPLE, BY RAISING AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT MATTERS THAT AFFECT THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL END SEXUAL HEALTH.
Maes buddion
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.