Dogfen lywodraethu SHERBORNE ARTS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 NOVEMBER 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 16 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 11 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23 FEB 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE, AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY:- (1) ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING AN ARTS CENTRE, GALLERY AND EXHIBITION SPACE; (2) PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE PARTICIPATION AND EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ARTS; AND (3) FOSTERING AND PROMOTING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.