Dogfen lywodraethu International Federation of Surgical Colleges and Societies (IFSCS) Ltd

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/10/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11/11/2011 as amended on 28 Feb 2024 as amended on 01 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The advancement of health, saving of lives and relief of suffering from surgical conditions, through advocacy for surgeons at global institutions such as the WHO and the UN, through supporting surgical education, research and care worldwide, and to help implement global surgical programmes, especially in underserved communities.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.