Hanes ariannol DHIYAHUL-HAG ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF NIGERIA-UNITED KINGDOM BRANCH
Rhif yr elusen: 1149621

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £8.48k | £2.54k | £5.39k | £9.64k | £8.31k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.66k | £2.87k | £1.62k | £5.43k | £1.89k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.