Dogfen lywodraethu KILBURN ISLAMIC CENTRE LTD

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18/10/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/05/2014 as amended on 30 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE ISLAM RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC WITHIN THE UK AND TO FORM PARTNERSHIPS WITH OTHER OVERSEA BODIES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM FIT.
Maes buddion
CAMDEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.