Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN METRO ROCHDALE
Rhif yr elusen: 503559
Elusen a dynnwyd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MARCH 1974 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1984, 14 OCTOBER 1987, 16 MARCH 1994 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 1995
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF ROCHDALE.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF ROCHDALE
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.