Dogfen lywodraethu THE HARROGATE AND DISTRICT NATURALISTS' SOCIETY
Rhif yr elusen: 503860

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Manylion am y math o ddogfen lywodraethu sydd gan yr elusen a phan y'i sefydlwyd.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AND BYE LAWS ADOPTED 24 APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 1975, 26 APRIL 1978 AND 24 APRIL 2003. as amended on 10 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION AND DISSEMINATION OF NATURAL HISTORY KNOWLEDGE IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND ALSO TO DIRECT ITS ENERGIES TO SOME PRACTICAL FORM OF NATURE CONSERVATION.
Maes buddion
Y maes y gall yr elusen weithredu ynddo, fel y nodir yn ei dogfen lywodraethu.
HARROGATE AND DISTRICT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.