Elusennau cysylltiedig THE SAMARITANS OF DORSET AT WEYMOUTH
Rhif yr elusen: 1168117

Mae'r adroddiad gan yr elusen wedi'i ddiweddaru (ar amser)
Elusennau cysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1974 AS AMENDED 17 MARCH 1992, 16 MARCH 1993, 16 SEPTEMBER 2003 AND 16 JANUARY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION.
Maes buddion
DORSET AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 08 Hydref 1974 : Cofrestrwyd
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.