Dogfen lywodraethu Cardiff and Vale Youth Orchestra Association

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 1980 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 1980, 4 JULY 1987, 12 OCTOBER 1990, 4 OCTOBER 2002, as amended on 20 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE MUSICAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN OR RECEIVE THEIR EDUCATION WITHIN THE COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, FACILITIES OR AMENITIES NOT NOW ADEQUATELY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2OF THE CONSTITUTION.)
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF SOUTH GLAMORGAN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.